Rossich v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Illderbrando Rossich
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv05829
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BNSF Railway Company.(Chait, Michael)
October 24, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/31/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/7/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 24, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 19, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M. McCool. (KEB)
October 17, 2018 Attorney Hayley Suzanne Ventoza for BNSF Railway Company added; per #6 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
October 17, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Eliott Chait on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Chait, Michael)
October 16, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
October 16, 2018 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 1/14/2019. (KEB)
October 16, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/31/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/7/2019, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
October 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KEB)
October 16, 2018 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 12/14/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
October 16, 2018 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant BNSF Railway Company (CMG)
October 16, 2018 Judge David W. Christel added. (CMG)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant BNSF Railway Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5505192), filed by Illderbrando Rossich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Vucinovich, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossich v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illderbrando Rossich
Represented By: James K Vucinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Hayley Suzanne Ventoza
Represented By: Michael Eliott Chait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?