DiscoverOrg Data, LLC v. Management Science Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC
Defendant: Management Science Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05841
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jie Smith filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data, LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Du Wors, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Will Hinrichs filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data, LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Du Wors, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Philip Watson filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data, LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Du Wors, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data, LLC, to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Oral Argument Requested. (Du Wors, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Jaime Drozd Allen. Filed by Defendant Management Science Associates, Inc.. (Allen, Jaime)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Extending Time and Re-noting Motion re #10 Stipulation filed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue re-noted for 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Jaime Drozd Allen. Filed by Defendant Management Science Associates, Inc.. (Allen, Jaime) Modified firm address on 12/11/2018 (DS).
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND AND TO RENOTE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE by parties re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Durrance, Nathaniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Alfred Kuehn filed by Defendant Management Science Associates, Inc. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Allen, Jaime)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, filed by Defendant Management Science Associates, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/14/2018, (Allen, Jaime)
November 14, 2018 Attorney Benjamin J Robbins for Management Science Associates, Inc. added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jaime Drozd Allen on behalf of Defendant Management Science Associates, Inc.. (Allen, Jaime)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/23/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Management Science Associates, Inc. on 10/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. (Du Wors, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC (Du Wors, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (CMG)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Management Science Associates, Inc. (CMG)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/24/2018. (CMG)
October 17, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (CMG)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Management Science Associates, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5510044), filed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Du Wors, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC v. Management Science Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Nathaniel Eli Durrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management Science Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: Benjamin J Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?