NWDC Resistance et al v. Immigration & Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, NWDC Resistance and Detention Watch Network
Defendant: Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Donato Vitiello and Kirstjen M Nielsen
Case Number: 3:2018cv05860
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth G Simpson for Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites and NWDC Resistance, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Khaled Alrabe for Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites and NWDC Resistance, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s). Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Ronald Donato Vitiello, filed by Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, NWDC Resistance.(Doran, Ambika)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Khaled Alrabe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, NWDC Resistance (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5589228 (Doran, Ambika)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth Simpson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, NWDC Resistance (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5589200 (Doran, Ambika)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ambika K Doran. Filed by Plaintiffs Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, Detention Watch Network, NWDC Resistance. (Doran, Ambika) Modified Firm Address on 12/13/2018 (DS).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/10/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert E Miller on behalf of Plaintiffs Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, Detention Watch Network, NWDC Resistance. (Miller, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel H Herd on behalf of Plaintiffs Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, Detention Watch Network, NWDC Resistance. (Herd, Rachel)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Max Bamberger Hensley on behalf of Plaintiffs Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, Detention Watch Network, NWDC Resistance. (Hensley, Max)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bruce EH Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, Detention Watch Network, NWDC Resistance. (Johnson, Bruce)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SNP)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:18-cv-1558 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:18-cv-5860-RBL. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorneys Guide to Opening a Civil Case to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SNP)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5517583) Attorney Ambika K Doran added to party Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites(pty:pla), Attorney Ambika K Doran added to party Detention Watch Network(pty:pla), Attorney Ambika K Doran added to party NWDC Resistance(pty:pla), filed by Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites, NWDC Resistance, Detention Watch Network. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Immigration & Customs Enforcement, #3 Summons Ronald Donato Vitiello, #4 Summons Kirstjen Nielsen)(Doran, Ambika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NWDC Resistance et al v. Immigration & Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition of Anti-Racist Whites
Represented By: Ambika K Doran
Represented By: Bruce EH Johnson
Represented By: Robert E Miller
Represented By: Rachel H Herd
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Max Bamberger Hensley
Represented By: Elizabeth G Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NWDC Resistance
Represented By: Ambika K Doran
Represented By: Bruce EH Johnson
Represented By: Robert E Miller
Represented By: Rachel H Herd
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Max Bamberger Hensley
Represented By: Elizabeth G Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detention Watch Network
Represented By: Ambika K Doran
Represented By: Bruce EH Johnson
Represented By: Robert E Miller
Represented By: Rachel H Herd
Represented By: Max Bamberger Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Donato Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?