Meyer v. Uttecht

Petitioner: Shannon Edward Meyer
Respondent: Jeffry Uttecht and Jeffrey A Uttecht
Case Number: 3:2018cv05864
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
0 Judge: Robert J Bryan
1 Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Habeas petition ripe on 1/11/2019. **DO NOT PRINT**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(GMR)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Respondent Jeffrey A Uttecht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1-18 pp. 1-616)**PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(Kostin, Alex)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jeffrey A Uttecht. Noting Date 1/11/2019, **PRINT ALL**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(Kostin, Alex)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alex A Kostin on behalf of Respondent Jeffrey A Uttecht. **PRINT ALL**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(Kostin, Alex)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 28 U.C.S. 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. ( #3 Petition and this Order emailed 11/16/18) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(SP)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shannon Edward Meyer. (Receipt # TAC015405) **35 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(GMR)
November 5, 2018 IFP #2 deficiency corrected upon payment of filing fee. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(GMR)
November 5, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number TAC015405. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(GMR)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 11/26/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(SP)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 PROPOSED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Shannon Edward Meyer. (No Filing Fee or IFP Application) **35 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Shannon Meyer, Prisoner ID: 731057)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffry Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey A Uttecht
Represented By: Alex A Kostin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shannon Edward Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?