Latimer v. Hammond et al

Plaintiff: Keith Latimer
Defendant: Steven Hammond, Care Review Committee and G Steven Hammond
Case Number: 3:2018cv05884
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/19/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/27/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/27/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to attach Exhibits A-I in Support of #4 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Keith Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(GMR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against defendants Care Review Committee and G. Steven Hammond with JURY DEMAND, filed by Keith Latimer. (Receipt # TAC015424) (GMR)
November 20, 2018 Filing Fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number TAC015424. (GMR)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Pltf's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff has 21 days to pay the filing or voluntarily dismiss this matter, otherwise, this matter will be dismissed without further notice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 11/9/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Keith Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Lawsuit; Waiver of Service of Summons)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latimer v. Hammond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Review Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Steven Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?