Friend v. Downey et al

Plaintiff: Horace G Friend
Defendant: Bill Westrate and Paula Downey
Case Number: 3:2018cv05894
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE/MOTION TO DENY, re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Horace G Friend. (GMR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY, filed by Defendant Paula Downey, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sbaih, Jeff)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Horace G Friend. Noting Date 1/4/2019. (GMR)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Kelley Hill filed by Defendant Paula Downey re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sbaih, Jeff)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant Paula Downey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/28/2018, (Sbaih, Jeff)
November 28, 2018 Attorney Jeff M Sbaih for Paula Downey added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (ELS)
November 28, 2018 JSR due 2/26/2019. (JL)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/12/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/19/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/26/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. . Modified on 11/28/2018 (JL).
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Paula Downey, Bill Westrate with JURY DEMAND, filed by Horace G Friend. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. Modified on 11/28/2018 (JL).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dylan E Jackson on behalf of Defendant Paula Downey. (Jackson, Dylan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Horace G Friend. (SP)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, renoting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Horace G Friend. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friend v. Downey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Westrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Downey
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace G Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?