Gonzalez v. Dammeier et al

Plaintiff: Sebastian Gonzalez
Defendant: County of Pierce, Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy T. Dickerson #96-086, Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy #05-004, Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy #96-016, Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy N. Lee #01-052, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy Deflippis, Acting Sergeants(s) of Pierce County Jail (From Present) John Doe(s), Pierce County Jail Clinic Staff Members Who Treated Plaintiff For Injuries on, Pat McCarthy, Pierce County Jail, Pierce Co. Executive Bruce Dammeier, Pierce County Sheriff's Department, T. Dickerson, John Doe(s), Bruce Dammeier, N. Lee and Deflippis
Case Number: 3:2018cv05895
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE-NOTING #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Def Pierce County's 12(B)(6) Motion ; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Accordingly, the Court hereby RE-NOTES defendants' motions to dismiss for consideration on January 25, 2019. (SP)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Leah R Altaras for Plaintiff Sebastian Gonzalez from 12/24/18-1/22/19. (Altaras, Leah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY, filed by Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Def Pierce County's 12(B)(6) Motion, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Childers, Kathryn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Defendants County of Pierce, Bruce Dammeier, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Hamilton, Daniel)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Def Pierce County's 12(B)(6) Motion, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Denying motions (Altaras, Leah)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Sebastian Gonzalez, to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Def Pierce County's 12(B)(6) Motion, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Altaras, Leah)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Sebastian Gonzalez.(Altaras, Leah)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Def Pierce County's 12(B)(6) Motion, filed by Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC. Noting Date 11/30/2018, (Childers, Kathryn)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants County of Pierce, Bruce Dammeier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/30/2018, (Hamilton, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Correct Care Solutions Group Holdings, LLC for Correct Care Solutions, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Childers, Kathryn)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/13/2018. (KB)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Robert J. Bryan. The referral judge in this case is the Honorable Judge Theresa L. Fricke. (KB)
November 5, 2018 Judge Robert J. Bryan and Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (KB)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Childers, Kathryn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathryn Childers on behalf of Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (Childers, Kathryn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Childers, Kathryn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal filed with State Court in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC. inre #3 Notice of Removal. (Childers, Kathryn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to attach document Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet re #3 Notice of Removal by Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Childers, Kathryn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 18-2-10989-8; (Receipt # 0981-5531146), filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC.(Childers, Kathryn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Bruce Dammeier, Pierce County Jail, Pierce County Sheriff's Department. (Hamilton, Daniel)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 18-2-10989-8; (Receipt # 0981-5530660), filed by County of Pierce, Bruce Dammeier, Pierce County Sheriff's Department, Pierce County Jail. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summons Exh B-Summons & Declarations of Service)(Hamilton, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: #4 Jury Demand) (KB). Modified on 11/5/2018 to add state court Jury Demand (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Dammeier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Pierce
Represented By: Daniel R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy T. Dickerson #96-086
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy #05-004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy #96-016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy N. Lee #01-052
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Childers
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Sheriff's Deputy Deflippis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Sergeants(s) of Pierce County Jail (From Present) John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Jail Clinic Staff Members Who Treated Plaintiff For Injuries on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Jail
Represented By: Daniel R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce Co. Executive Bruce Dammeier
Represented By: Daniel R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Daniel R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dammeier
Represented By: Daniel R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deflippis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Gonzalez
Represented By: Leah R Altaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?