State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America

Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United State of America and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05911
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/24/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/31/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America. (KB)
November 8, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (MacMillan, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United State of America (Receipt # 0981-5535674) Attorney John Roderic MacMillan added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(MacMillan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Roderic MacMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?