Martin v. Inslee et al

Plaintiff: William Martin
Defendant: Jay Inslee, Jeff Uttecht, Jerry Wonders, Ms Jane Nessen, Stephen Bolinger, Steve Sinclair and Stephen Sinclair
Case Number: 3:2018cv05929
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Response to Show Cause #5 Order due by 1/18/2019. **DO NOT PRINT**(William Martin, Prisoner ID: 401212)(SP)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR TO AMEND #4 Complaint; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Plaintiff is directed to Show Cause or Amend Complaint on or before January 18, 2019. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form (blank), #2 Amended Defendant List (blank), #3 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**18 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(William Martin, Prisoner ID: 401212)(SP)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Stephen Bolinger, Jay Inslee, Jane Nessen, Stephen Sinclair, Jeff Uttecht, and Jerry Wonders with JURY DEMAND, filed by William Martin. (IFP Granted) **43 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(William Martin, Prisoner ID: 401212)(SP)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(William Martin, Prisoner ID: 401212)(SP)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to plaintiff re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(William Martin, Prisoner ID: 401212)(GMR)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by William Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause)**50 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(William Martin, Prisoner ID: 401212)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Wonders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Jane Nessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?