Bushaw v. Hitchings

Plaintiff: Heather Bushaw
Defendant: Ann Hitchings
Case Number: 3:2018cv05955
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Ann Hitchings (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Fogg, Christina)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/19/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/26/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/26/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel and pro se plaintiff re receipt of case from Thurston County District Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR- cc: pltf)
November 23, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County District Court, case number 34385; filed by Ann Hitchings. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fogg, Christina) (No Fee Required) Modified on 11/23/2018 (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushaw v. Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Hitchings
Represented By: Christina Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Bushaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?