Pace v. Lundh

Plaintiff: Stanley Pace
Defendant: Joran Lundh
Case Number: 3:2018cv05965
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/19/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of a Trademark action. Report emailed to the US Patent Office. (GMR)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Joran Lundh. (GMR)
November 23, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Joran Lundh with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5552955), filed by Stanley Pace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Linke, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace v. Lundh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joran Lundh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Pace
Represented By: Derek Linke
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?