Pena v. Holbrook

Petitioner: Angelino L Pena
Respondent: Holbrook and Donald R Holbrook
Case Number: 3:2018cv05975
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Douglas Weisser on behalf of Respondent Donald R Holbrook. **PRINT ALL**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(Weisser, Paul)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel via e-mail upon the respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington. ( #9 Petition, #5 WA Supreme Court PRP Denial Order and this order emailed on 12/19/2018.) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(GMR)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Angelino L Pena. (IFP Granted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits C-H)**67 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(SP) Modified on 12/18/2018 (GMR).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(SP)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 IFP deficiency corrected: signed signature page received re #4 Application. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(SP)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 SECOND LETTER to Petitioner re IFP deficiency: - The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is incomplete. Page 2 of Application was not signed by petitioner. Please sign your application and return it to the Court as soon as possible. Filer has until 1/3/2019 to correct. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(GMR)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Washington State Supreme Court Order Denying Personal Restraint Petition re #1 PROPOSED 2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus; filed by Petitioner Angelino L Pena. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(GMR)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Prison Trust Statement (unsigned) filed by Petitioner Angelino L Pena. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(GMR) Modified on 12/17/2018 (SP).
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/27/2018 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(MET)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus (No Filing Fee or IFP) filed by Petitioner Angelino L Pena (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)**67 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Angelino Pena, Prisoner ID: 828071)(MET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angelino L Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald R Holbrook
Represented By: Paul Douglas Weisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?