United States of America v. Newby et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thurston County, Lawn Limited, MGMT Limited, Percy F. Newby, Church of God and Apostles and Percy F Newby
Case Number: 3:2018cv05978
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Defendant Lawn Limited's Motion to Dismiss; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 1/8/2019 (DN). (cc to Def Newby)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Donovan McDermott in support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Due to Plaintiff's Insufficient Service of Process, filed by Defendant Lawn Limited. (SP)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Due to Plaintiff's Insufficient Service of Process, filed by Defendant Lawn Limited. Noted by clerk for: 1/25/2019. (SP)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Thurston County.(Peters, Donald)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Percy F Newby, pro se. (GMR)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald R Peters, Jr on behalf of Defendant Thurston County. (Peters, Donald)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/4/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/11/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Church of God and Apostles, Lawn Limited, MGMT Limited, Percy F Newby, Thurston County (Attachments: #1 Summons Lawn Limited, #2 Summons MGMT Limited, #3 Summons Church of God and Apostles, #4 Summons Thurston County)(KB)
November 30, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Jennifer Y Golden added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Percy Newby, #3 Summons - Lawn Limited, #4 Summons - MGMT Limited, #5 Summons - Church of God and Apostles, #6 Summons - Thurston County)(Golden, Jennifer) (No fee required) Modified on 11/30/2018 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Newby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thurston County
Represented By: Donald R Peters, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawn Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGMT Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy F. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of God and Apostles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy F Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Y Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?