Barry v. Simpson

Plaintiff: Robert Eugene Barry
Respondent: Sheriff Gary Simpson and Gary Simpson
Case Number: 3:2018cv06003
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: J Richard Creatura
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Petitioner Robert Eugene Barry (Arbenz, Casey)
December 28, 2018 Response to Show Cause #3 Order due by 2/1/2019. (GMR)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Show Cause Response due on or before 2/1/2019. (GMR)
December 10, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Judge J Richard Creatura added. (KB)
December 7, 2018 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Plaintiff Robert Eugene Barry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Arbenz, Casey)
December 7, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5573266), filed by Robert Eugene Barry.(Arbenz, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry v. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Eugene Barry
Represented By: Casey M Arbenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Gary Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?