Valdovinos-Perez v. United States of America

Petitioner: Fabian Valdovinos-Perez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv06015
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY by Petitioner Fabian Valdovinos-Perez to Government's #4 Response to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (GMR)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),. (Jaquette, Amy)
December 17, 2018 2255 #1 Motion noted for consideration on: 2/1/2019. (GMR)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The United States shall file an answer by January 18, 2019, and any reply by Petitioner shall be filed and served on or before February 1, 2019, and the Clerk shall note the 2255 motion on the Court's calendar for February 1, 2019. (GMR- cc: petitioner)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Fabian Valdovinos-Perez. Related to criminal case: 3:14-cr-05159-BHS-8. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of 2255 Motion, #2 IFP Application, #3 envelope)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdovinos-Perez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Amy Jaquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fabian Valdovinos-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?