Animal Legal Defense Fund v. Olympic Game Farm Inc et al
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Defendant: James Beebe, Robert Beebe, Olympic Game Farm, Kenneth Beebe and Olympic Game Farm Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv06025
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James Beebe, Kenneth Beebe, Robert Beebe, Olympic Game Farm Inc.(Morgan, Jason)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexander Penalta for James Beebe, Kenneth Beebe, Robert Beebe and Olympic Game Farm Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexander Penalta FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants James Beebe, Kenneth Beebe, Robert Beebe, Olympic Game Farm Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5638080 (Morgan, Jason)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexandra J Monson for Animal Legal Defense Fund, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexandra J. Monson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Animal Legal Defense Fund (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5616429 (Smith, Rob Roy)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 2/13/19; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendants James Beebe, Kenneth Beebe, Robert Beebe, Olympic Game Farm Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/9/2019, (Morgan, Jason)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by James Beebe, Kenneth Beebe, Robert Beebe, Olympic Game Farm Inc (Morgan, Jason)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason T Morgan on behalf of Defendants James Beebe, Kenneth Beebe, Robert Beebe, Olympic Game Farm Inc. (Morgan, Jason)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kenneth Beebe on 12/22/2018, filed by Plaintiff Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Smith, Rob Roy)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on James Beebe on 12/22/2018, filed by Plaintiff Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Smith, Rob Roy)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Robert Beebe on 12/22/2018, filed by Plaintiff Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Smith, Rob Roy)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Olympic Game Farm on 12/22/2018, filed by Plaintiff Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Smith, Rob Roy)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/14/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Harold Lutz on behalf of Plaintiff Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Lutz, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Saimons on behalf of Plaintiff Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Saimons, Rachel)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER RE CASE OPENING DEFICIENCY. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) James Beebe, Kenneth Beebe, Robert Beebe and Olympic Game Farm Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GMR)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Smith, Rob Roy)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5585243), filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Smith, Rob Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund v. Olympic Game Farm Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Beebe
Represented By: Alexander Penalta
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Beebe
Represented By: Alexander Penalta
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympic Game Farm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Beebe
Represented By: Alexander Penalta
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympic Game Farm Inc
Represented By: Alexander Penalta
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Daniel Harold Lutz
Represented By: Rob Roy Smith
Represented By: Rachel Saimons
Represented By: Alexandra J Monson
Represented By: Daniel Harold Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?