Satkowski v. United States of America

Petitioner: Stosh Satkowski
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv05026
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Velamoor, Siddharth)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Mail addressed to Stosh Satkowski returned as Undeliverable (Not Here - Return to Sender) re #3 Order. (ERA)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Mail addressed to Stosh Satkowski returned as Undeliverable (Not Here - Return to Sender) re #2 Letter. (ERA)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Matthew H Thomas for Respondent United States of America. (Thomas, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Noting Date Set/Reset re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) : Noting Date 3/22/2019. (DK)
January 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to petition due by 2/19/2019, Reply Brief due by 3/19/2019. (DK)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER by Judge Ronald B. Leighton, re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Copy mailed to Petitioner @ FCI Sheridan.) (DK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Stosh Satkowski. Related to criminal case: 3:16-cr-05535-RBL-2. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satkowski v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stosh Satkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Siddharth V Velamoor
Represented By: Mark P Parrent
Represented By: Matthew H Thomas
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?