Ammons v. Light et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ammons
Defendant: Scott Light, Shane L Evans, Ron Haynes, Evrst Mac, Kevin Bovenkamp, Kerri S McTarsney, H Wilson, A Manson, J Nagala, Luciano Figueroa, J Rogers, Parris, Dale N Caldwell, Anand Suresh, N Springer and Bradley Fehrenbach
Case Number: 3:2019cv05028
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Response to Show Cause #7 Order due by 3/25/2019. **DO NOT PRINT**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(SP)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR AMEND #6 Complaint by 3/25/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to adequately address the issues raised herein, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Attachments: #1 1983 Civil Rights Complaint Form (blank), #2 Amended Defendant List (blank), #3 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**12 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(SP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kevin Bovenkamp, Dale N Caldwell, Shane L Evans, Bradley Fehrenbach, Luciano Figueroa, Ron Haynes, Scott Light, Evrst Mac, A Manson, Kerri S McTarsney, J Nagala, Parris, J Rogers, N Springer, Anand Suresh and H Wilson, filed by Kenneth Ammons. (IFP Granted) **26 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(SP)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(SP- cc: Order/Plaintiff's Acknowledgment and Authorization portion of IFP to PLRA contact person)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(SP- cc: Order/Plaintiff's Acknowledgment and Authorization portion of IFP to PLRA contact person) Modified on 2/26/2019 to reflect incorrect event used while docketing (SP).
February 1, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected upon filing of #3 proper MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(SP)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Kenneth Ammons. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(SP)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Plaintiff re IFP deficiency: - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 2/11/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(GMR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Ammons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**32 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Kenneth Ammons, Prisoner ID: 783979)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ammons v. Light et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evrst Mac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bovenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri S McTarsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Nagala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luciano Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale N Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Suresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Fehrenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?