Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Ramona Carol Watson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv05029
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TW)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ramona Carol Watson (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Ramona Carol Watson.(TW)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(TW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for all further proceedings. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M. McCool. (TW)
January 11, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (KB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Ramona Carol Watson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAO, #5 Summons OGC)(Kerr, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Carol Watson
Represented By: Kevin Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?