Flournoy v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Flournoy Jr and Kenneth Wayne Flournoy, Jr
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv05035
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M. McCool. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. Donohue's successor, Magistrate Judge Michelle L. Peterson. Cc to MLP. (AE)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daphne Banay on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Banay, Daphne)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to US Attorney Western Washington & OGC Social Security Administration on 1/15/2019, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Wayne Flournoy, Jr. (Talbot, Charles)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. James P. Donohue. (TF)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney).(KB)
January 14, 2019 Hon. James P. Donohue added. (KB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kenneth Wayne Flournoy Jr (Receipt # 0981-5611122) Attorney Charles W Talbot added to party Kenneth Wayne Flournoy Jr(pty:pla), filed by Kenneth Wayne Flournoy Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Talbot, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flournoy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daphne Banay
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Flournoy Jr
Represented By: Charles W Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Flournoy, Jr
Represented By: Charles W Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?