Somarakis v. US Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: John Somarakis
Defendant: Lisa Hackney, U.S. Bank National Association, John Doe Hackney, North Star Trustee, LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, US Bank National Association, North Star Trustee LLC and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05036
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton granting #10 Motion to Remand, denying #17 Motion to Restrain Trustee's Sale, and denying #21 Motion for Default. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded 14 days from the date of this Order, on 2/28/2019. (DK)
February 13, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M. McCool. (TW)
February 12, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by John Doe Hackney, Lisa Hackney, North Star Trustee LLC.(Pierce, Tom)
February 12, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, US Bank National Association.(Abbott, Thomas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis re #21 MOTION for Default (Andersen, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/22/2019, (Andersen, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of John Somarakis filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis re #17 MOTION to Restrain Trustee's Sale (Andersen, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Steven C. Andersen filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis re #17 MOTION to Restrain Trustee's Sale (Andersen, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Marty Miller filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis re #17 MOTION to Restrain Trustee's Sale (Andersen, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Restrain Trustee's Sale , filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andersen, Steven)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff John Somarakis re #10 MOTION to Remand and proposed Order, #11 Declaration (Andersen, Steven)
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on LISA HACKNEY AND JOHN DOE HACKNEY on 12/27/2018, filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis. (Andersen, Steven)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on North Star Trustee Services on 12/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis. (Andersen, Steven)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by North Star Trustee LLC (Pierce, Tom)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re consent refusal deadline. Due to the filing of the Plaintiff's Motion for Remand, the deadline for declining consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke is accelerated to 2/8/2019. Parties will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge unless the consent declination form is returned by the new due date. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William McCool. (TW)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Steven C. Andersen filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis re #10 MOTION to Remand and proposed Order (Andersen, Steven)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand and proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis. Noting Date 2/8/2019, (Andersen, Steven)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Steven C Andersen. Filed by Plaintiff John Somarakis. (Andersen, Steven) Modified address on 1/16/2019 (DS).
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s). John Doe Hackney, Lisa Hackney, North Star Trustee LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, US Bank National Association, filed by John Somarakis.(Andersen, Steven)
January 15, 2019 Joint Status Report Deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 4/15/2019, (TW)
January 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #5 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TW)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/1/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/8/2019, If declining consent, return the executed form by 3/6/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 3/6/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants US Bank National Association, North Star Trustee LLC, and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/22/2019. (KB)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
January 14, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (KB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Washington, Clark County, case number 18-2-06521-06; (Receipt # 0981-5611447) Attorney Thomas N Abbott added to party Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas N Abbott added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Abbott, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somarakis v. US Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Somarakis
Represented By: Steven C Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Hackney
Represented By: Tom Bao Pierce
Represented By: Scott D Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Thomas N Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Hackney
Represented By: Tom Bao Pierce
Represented By: Scott D Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Trustee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas N Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Thomas N Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Trustee LLC
Represented By: Tom Bao Pierce
Represented By: Scott D Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas N Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?