Moore v. Esper
Plaintiff: Edgar L Moore
Defendant: Mark Esper and Mark T Esper
Case Number: 3:2019cv05055
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against defendant Mark T Esper with JURY DEMAND, filed by Edgar L Moore. (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # TAC015553) (GMR)
February 27, 2019 Filing fee received: $400, receipt number TAC015553. (SP)
January 24, 2019 Fee due 3/1/2019. (JL)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee due by 3/1/19. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re [1-1] Proposed Complaint. Exhibits to complaint contain personal identifiers that are required to be redacted per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2, and has been administratively sealed. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. (MET) cc: plaintiff
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Edgar L Moore. (Attachments: SEALED #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ERA) Modified on 1/18/2019 to seal (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?