Entrepreneur Media Inc v. Hobley et al

Plaintiff: Entrepreneur Media, Inc. and Entrepreneur Media Inc
Defendant: Does 1-10, Our World Enterprises, LLC, David D Hobley and Our World Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05078
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Stipulated #20 Motion to Seal Exhibit B to Defendants' #15 Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Stipulated #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
February 21, 2019 REFERRING #20 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Seal Exhibit B to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint and #19 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Judge Benjamin H. Settle (TW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Due to the filing of several motions, and the deadline for declination of consent not being reached, this case is reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke is no longer assigned to this matter. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Seal Exhibit B to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Entrepreneur Media Inc. Noting Date 2/21/2019, (Willey, Stephen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline, filed by Plaintiff Entrepreneur Media Inc. Noting Date 2/21/2019, (Willey, Stephen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Our World Enterprises, LLC on 1/30/2018, filed by Plaintiff Entrepreneur Media Inc. (Willey, Stephen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on David D. Hobley on 1/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff Entrepreneur Media Inc. (Willey, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ; by Defendants David D Hobley, Our World Enterprises LLC. (Hobley, David)
February 20, 2019 Noting Date Set re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Noting Date 3/1/2019. (TW)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by David D Hobley, Our World Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Formal Request For Extension Of Time To File Defendants Answer To Complaint Exhibits Combined, #2 Exhibit A - 17. My Reply To EMI Statement On No Need For Answer To Complaint To Courts, #3 SEALED per #23 Order Exhibit B - 23. EMI Reply To My Tentative Acceptance of Settlement Offer)(Hobley, David) Docket type corrected on 2/20/2019 (TW). Modified on 2/22/2019 (GMR).
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE: Defendant David D Hobley has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (ELS)
January 31, 2019 JSR deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 5/1/2019, (TW)
January 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #11 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TW)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/24/2019, If declining consent, return the executed form by 4/1/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 4/1/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing of a Trademark action, emailed to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (GMR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) David D Hobley, Our World Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GMR)
January 29, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (GMR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick C Justman for Entrepreneur Media, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer L Barry for Entrepreneur Media, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Perry J Viscounty for Entrepreneur Media, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick C. Justman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Entrepreneur Media, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5629756 (Willey, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer L. Barry FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Entrepreneur Media, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5629752 (Willey, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Perry J. Viscounty FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Entrepreneur Media, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5629740 (Willey, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Entrepreneur Media, Inc. (Willey, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5629715), filed by Entrepreneur Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Willey, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entrepreneur Media Inc v. Hobley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entrepreneur Media, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick C Justman
Represented By: Perry J Viscounty
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Represented By: Jennifer L Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entrepreneur Media Inc
Represented By: Patrick C Justman
Represented By: Perry J Viscounty
Represented By: Jennifer L Barry
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Our World Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D Hobley
Represented By: David D Hobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Our World Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?