Pearse v. Quality Loan Service Corp et al
Plaintiff: Herbert R. Pearse and Herbert R Pearse
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington, Sierra West, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Commonwealth Land Title Co., First Horizon Home Loans, The Bank of New York Mellon, First Horizon Home Loan Corporation, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Commonwealth Land Title Co and Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05087
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Herbert R Pearse in Support of #32 Response to #27 MOTION to Dismiss. (SP)
March 21, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Herbert R Pearse, to Defendants' #27 MOTION to Dismiss . (SP)
March 7, 2019 Filing 31 PRAECIPE re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder to Motion to Dismiss of CoDefendants Nationstar, et al., #30 Request, Amended Proposed Order by Defendant First Horizon Home Loan Corporation (Deltchev, Delian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Defendant First Horizon Home Loan Corporation for Judicial Notice re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder to Motion to Dismiss of CoDefendants Nationstar, et al. (Deltchev, Delian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder to Motion to Dismiss of CoDefendants Nationstar, et al., filed by Defendant First Horizon Home Loan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/5/2019, (Deltchev, Delian)
March 1, 2019 Noting Date Set re #27 MOTION to Dismiss : Noting Date 4/5/2019 (Per filer's request) (SWT)
March 1, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Gibbons filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon re #27 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Gibbons, Daniel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/22/2019, (Gibbons, Daniel)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #23 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Notice filed by Plaintiff Herbert R Pearse re #23 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (GMR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff Herbert R Pearse in Support of #23 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (GMR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Herbert R Pearse. Noting Date 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Motion)(GMR)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; First Horizon Home Loan Corporation answer due 3/8/2019; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 2/20/2019 (DN). (cc to pltf)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc answer due 3/1/2019; Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 3/1/2019; The Bank of New York Mellon answer due 3/1/2019; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 2/20/2019 (DN). (cc to pltf)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/2/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 2/19/2019 (DN). (cc to pltf)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 2/19/2019 (DN). (cc to pltf)
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M. McCool. (KEB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) by Defendants Bank of New York Mellon, Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(Gibbons, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Quality Loan Service Corp (McDonald, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
February 8, 2019 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 5/9/2019. (KEB)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 5/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/2/2019, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #13 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KEB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 2/15/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Defendants Bank of New York Mellon, Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/15/2019, (Gibbons, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven Joseph Dixson on behalf of Defendants Bank of New York Mellon, Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Dixson, Steven)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent First Horizon National Corporation for First Horizon Home Loans. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First Horizon Home Loans (Deltchev, Delian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Answering Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant First Horizon Home Loans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/15/2019, (Deltchev, Delian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Delian P Deltchev. Filed by Defendant First Horizon Home Loans. (Deltchev, Delian) Modified firm association and address on 2/19/2019 (DS).
February 6, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Quality Loan Service Corp and First Horizon Home Loans must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 2/13/2019. (GMR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER Notice of Filing Deficiency: re #1 Notice of Removal (Secondary Attorney Signature & Change of Address). ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to counsel and pro se plaintiff re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR- cc: pltf PO Box and Gig Harbor address)
February 6, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (GMR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc, Corporate Parent WMIH Corp, Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Bank of New York Mellon (Gibbons, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2019 to correct filers only (GMR).
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Maroon Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Bank of New York Mellon (Gibbons, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2019 to correct filers only (GMR).
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Bank of New York Mellon (Gibbons, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2019 to correct filers only (GMR).
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit B, Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, State Docket, #4 Exhibit D, Notice to Clerk of Removal)(Gibbons, Daniel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 18-2-13639-9; (Receipt # 0981-5637333), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc, Bank of New York Mellon, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C)(Gibbons, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2019 (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearse v. Quality Loan Service Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Daniel J. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Daniel J. Gibbons
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Home Loan Corporation
Represented By: Delian P Deltchev
Represented By: Ann T Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Represented By: Robert W McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Gibbons
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registrations System Inc
Represented By: Daniel J. Gibbons
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert R. Pearse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert R Pearse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?