Yates v. United States of America

Petitioner: Michael Roger Yates
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv05151
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Michael Roger Yates. Noted by clerk for: 4/12/2019. (GMR)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER Requiring Answer and Setting Briefing Schedule, re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Michael Roger Yates. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (Copy mailed to Petitioner @ FCI Herlong CA.) (DK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
May 2, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Michael Roger Yates. Related to criminal case: 3:06-cr-05529-RBL. (Attachments: #1 Order from 9th Circuit Court of Appeals) Refer to attached Order from 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (18-71388) transferring petitioner's application to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington, to be processed as a section 2255 motion. The motion shall be deemed filed in the district court on May 2, 2018. (GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Gregory A Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Roger Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?