Edwards v. Holbrook

Petitioner: Steven Karl Edwards
Respondent: Donald R Holbrook
Case Number: 3:2019cv05153
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Habeas #1 petition ripe for consideration on 5/10/2019.**DO NOT PRINT**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103)(GMR)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD Respondent's Submission of Relevant State Court Record filed by Respondent Donald R Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1-4, #2 Exhibit Exs. 5-32)**PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103)(Weisser, Paul)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 Respondent's Answer and Memorandum of Authorities RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Donald R Holbrook. Noting Date 5/10/2019, **PRINT ALL**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103)(Weisser, Paul)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Douglas Weisser on behalf of Respondent Donald R Holbrook. **PRINT ALL**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103)(Weisser, Paul)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 28 U.C.S. 2254 PETITION signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel, via e-mail upon the respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington. ( #1 Petition and this order emailed 3/1/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103)(GMR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER to pro se petitioner re receipt of transfer case from the Eastern District of Washington and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103)(GMR)
February 28, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton and Judge David W. Christel added. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103)(GMR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern, Case Number 4:19-cv-05009.
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LR, Case Administrator) **2 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103) [Transferred from waed on 2/28/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number SPO033977 (VR, Courtroom Deputy) ** PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103) [Transferred from waed on 2/28/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH E-FILING PROGRAM. The Eastern District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 16-35-1, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at facilities participating in the Prison E-Filing Program. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the law librarian/designee for electronic filing. (LR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103) [Transferred from waed on 2/28/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit) (LR, Case Administrator) **3 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103) [Transferred from waed on 2/28/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $0, Receipt #IFP) Filed by Steven Karl Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(LR, Case Administrator) **15 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Steven Edwards, Prisoner ID: 327103) [Transferred from waed on 2/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Karl Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald R Holbrook
Represented By: Paul Douglas Weisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?