Mitchell v. Van Hook

Petitioner: George O Mitchell
Respondent: State of Washington and William Van Hook
Case Number: 3:2019cv05155
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua Choate on behalf of Respondent William Van Hook. (Choate, Joshua)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kelly A. Paradis on behalf of Respondent William Van Hook. (Paradis, Kelly)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua Choate on behalf of Respondent State of Washington. (Choate, Joshua)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kelly A. Paradis on behalf of Respondent State of Washington. (Paradis, Kelly)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon William Van Hook (GMR)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Attorney General's Office. (GMR)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION via Certified Mail to the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Washington, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. ( #5 Petition and this Order mailed 3/25/2019) (GMR- cc: petitioner w/Pro se Instruction Sheet)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. On March 15, 2019, Petitioner paid the filing fee. (SP- cc: petitioner)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by George O Mitchell. (Receipt # TAC015579) (GMR)
March 15, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number TAC015579. (GMR)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Petitioner to pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a certificate showing the amount of money or securities he has in any account at the Special Commitment Center (SCC); signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute William Van Hook as the Respondent in this action. The Clerk of Court is also directed to update the case title. (SP- cc: plaintiff)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (ERA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by George O Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #3 Envelope) (ERA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George O Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Represented By: Joshua Choate
Represented By: Kelly A. Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Van Hook
Represented By: Joshua Choate
Represented By: Kelly A. Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?