Davis v. Haynes

Petitioner: Anthony D Davis
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Case Number: 3:2019cv05156
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON MOTIONS denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel and re-noting #5 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #7 MOTION to Supplement the Record Based on Judicial Notice, #8 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing to Determine Factual Findings, #9 MOTION to Supplement, #12 MOTION to Determine Factual and Legal Claims, #13 MOTION for Relief from Judgment, and #17 MOTION for Exhaustion of State Court Remedies. Motions re-noted for 07/05/2019 . Objection #11 to be stricken from the docket per Order. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315) (ERA)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER. 28 U.S.C. 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. ( #16 Petition and this Order emailed 4/25/2019) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP)
April 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Exhaustion of State Court Remedies, filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. Noted by clerk for: 5/3/2019. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony D Davis. (IFP Granted) **16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S #6 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. The Clerk is directed to file petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus without the prepayment of fees. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST by Petitioner Anthony D Davis for updated case docket (attached). (Attachments: #1 docket sheet - updated)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(GMR)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED MOTION for Relief from Judgment filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(GMR) Modified on 4/24/2019 - converted to Motion as IFP granted (ERA).
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED MOTION to Determine Factual and Legal Claims filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(GMR) Modified on 4/24/2019 - converted to Motion as IFP granted (ERA).
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN PER #19 ORDER OBJECTIONS to any Extension of Time that may be Filed by Respondent, filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/26/2019) (ERA).
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED MOTION for Counsel, filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315) (ERA) Modified on 4/24/2019 - converted to Motion as IFP granted (ERA).
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Motion to Supplement, filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315) (ERA) Modified on 4/24/2019 - converted to Motion as IFP granted (ERA).
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing to Determine Factual Findings, filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP) Modified on 4/24/2019 - converted to Motion as IFP granted (ERA).
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED MOTION to Supplement the Record Based on Judicial Notice, filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP) Modified on 4/24/2019 - converted to Motion as IFP granted (ERA).
March 7, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected upon filing of corrected #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(GMR)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Anthony D Davis. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(GMR)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Petitioner Anthony D Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315)(SP) Modified on 4/24/2019- converted to Motion as IFP granted (GMR).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 4/4/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315) (ERA)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315) (ERA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Anthony D Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit) **19 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Anthony Davis, Prisoner ID: 259315) (ERA) Modified on 3/5/2019 (ERA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?