Beacock v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Chris A Beacock
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv05169
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Groebner, Benjamin)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAWAW.SSAClerk@usdoj.gov on 3/14/2019, filed by Plaintiff Chris A Beacock. (Evans, Jamie)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons US Attorney)(TF)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Chris A Beacock.(TF)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Pltf's #1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv-00319 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-05169-MLP. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SNP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Chris A. Beacock. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Proposed Summons, USAG, #4 Summons Proposed Summons, Regional Chief Counsel, #5 Summons Proposed Summons, Local US Atty)(Evans, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beacock v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris A Beacock
Represented By: Jamie Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Benjamin J. Groebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?