Icon Health & Fitness Inc v. Nautilus Inc
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness Inc
Defendant: Nautilus Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05217
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on STIPULATION re #20 Nautilus Inc answer due 7/8/2019, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Answer Deadline by parties (McBrayer, Ryan)
June 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines at the parties' request: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/12/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/19/2019, Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2019, (DN)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT on the Amended Filing of an action (addition of Patent No. 10,279,212). Report emailed to the US Patent Office. (GMR)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nautilus Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Icon Health & Fitness Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US Patent 9,403,047, #2 Exhibit 2-US Patent 10,188,890, #3 Exhibit 3-US Patent 10,279,212)(Larish, Inge)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles S Barquist for Icon Health & Fitness Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Nautilus Inc on 4/12/2019 (Larish, Inge)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles S. Barquist FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Icon Health & Fitness Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5744778 (Larish, Inge)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Stipulated Motion; Nautilus Inc answer due 6/3/2019; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/25/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/18/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
April 25, 2019 ***Consent deadline terminated; case reassigned to a district judge. (KAM)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Nautilus Inc. Noting Date 4/23/2019, (McBrayer, Ryan)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nautilus Inc (McBrayer, Ryan)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan McBrayer on behalf of Defendant Nautilus Inc. (McBrayer, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #5 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
March 27, 2019 JSR NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 6/25/2019. (KAM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 6/25/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/18/2019, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 5/28/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nautilus Inc (SNP)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SNP)
March 25, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv-00412 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-05217-JRC. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SNP)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent HF Holdings, Inc. for Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. (Larish, Inge)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Nautilus, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5696946) Attorney Inge Larish added to party Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -US Patent 9,403,047, #2 Exhibit 2- US Patent 10,188,890, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons)(Larish, Inge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Icon Health & Fitness Inc v. Nautilus Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Inc
Represented By: Ryan McBrayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness Inc
Represented By: Inge Larish
Represented By: Charles S Barquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?