Haque v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Hana Haque
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv05417
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim)
June 10, 2019 Attorneys Andrew Gordon Yates, Warren E. Babb, Jr, and Katie Bass added for National Railroad Passenger Corporation; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on National Railroad Passenger Corporation, d.b.a. AMTRAK c/o CT Corporation System on 5/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff Hana Haque. (Bosch, Carole)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (GMR)
May 15, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number TAC015685. (GMR)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Hana Haque (Bosch, Carole)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER of Filing Deficiency re #2 Summons - incomplete. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR)
May 15, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Hana Haque. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bosch, Carole)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Does 1-50 with JURY DEMAND, filed by Hana Haque.(Bosch, Carole) (Fee Pending) (Receipt # TAC015685) Modified on 5/15/2019 to add defendant and receipt information (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haque v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hana Haque
Represented By: Carole M Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?