Bjorkman v. American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania Inc

Plaintiff: Kiriaki Bjorkman and Kiriaki E Bjorkman
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Inc. and American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05423
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
June 10, 2019 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/9/2019. (KEB)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/3/2019, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. No declination forms received by deadline. (KEB)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Thomas J. Klusmeyer. Filed by Plaintiff Kiriaki E Bjorkman. (Klusmeyer, Thomas) Changed firm association on 5/29/2019 (DS).
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania Inc (Feig, Curt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 5/28/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO Attorney's for Plaintiff: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment., NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/24/2019. (SP)
May 17, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (SP)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Noah S. Jaffe re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Feig, Curt)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-06906-1; (Receipt # 0981-5768813) Attorney Curt H Feig added to party American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Operative Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 State Court Notice)(Feig, Curt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bjorkman v. American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiriaki Bjorkman
Represented By: Thomas J. Klusmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiriaki E Bjorkman
Represented By: Thomas J. Klusmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Inc.
Represented By: Noah S Jaffe
Represented By: Curt H Feig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania Inc
Represented By: Noah S Jaffe
Represented By: Curt H Feig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?