Fletcher et al v. IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Suzanne Fletcher, Fletcher John and John Fletcher
Defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05444
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Order of Dismissal, filed by Defendant IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company. Noting Date 7/18/2019, (Leid, Rory)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER re #9 Notice of Settlement filed by Defendants; all pending motions and trial dates are stricken; dismissal papers will be due by 7/22/19, if additional time is needed, please contact the Court at 253-882-3842; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Leid, Rory)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Lien ; filed by Plaintiffs John Fletcher, Suzanne Fletcher. (Bonrud, Neal)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/26/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ameriprise Financial Inc for IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Muth, Jeremy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rory W Leid, III on behalf of Defendant IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Leid, Rory)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal - Rory W Leid Signature. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/30/2019. (GMR)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Kitsap County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
May 23, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kitsap County Superior Court, case number 19-2-01213-18; (Receipt # 0981-5776458), filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D-G)(Muth, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher et al v. IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Fletcher
Represented By: Neal Ernest Bonrud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fletcher John
Represented By: Neal Ernest Bonrud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fletcher
Represented By: Neal Ernest Bonrud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: Jeremy Muth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?