The Mold Pros Franchising Inc v. MycoSolutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: The Mold Pros Franchising Inc
Defendant: MycoSolutions Inc, Marc Core and William Treinen
Case Number: 3:2019cv05454
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc, TO RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibits H and I to the Declaration of John Bohde In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Cox, Sarah)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew J Mertens for William Treinen, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew J. Mertens FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant William Treinen (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5846206 (Beane, Amanda)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of William Treinen In Support of Response to Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Defendant William Treinen re #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibits H and I to the Declaration of John Bohde In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Beane, Amanda)
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Defendant William Treinen, to #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibits H and I to the Declaration of John Bohde In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Beane, Amanda)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected Exhibit E) to the Declaration of Henry Pfutzenreuter re #18 Declaration, by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Cox, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Lisa Bass re #15 Sealed Document, #18 Declaration, #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibits H and I to the Declaration of John Bohde In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #16 Sealed Document, by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cox, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of John Bohde filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Cox, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Henry Pfutzenreuter filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Cox, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Cox, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit I to the Declaration of John Bohde by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc re #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibits H and I to the Declaration of John Bohde In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Cox, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit H to the Declaration of John Bohde by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc re #14 MOTION to Seal Exhibits H and I to the Declaration of John Bohde In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Cox, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Exhibits H and I to the Declaration of John Bohde In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/19/2019, (Cox, Sarah)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney R Henry Pfutzenreuter for The Mold Pros Franchising Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY R. Henry Pfutzenreuter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5826680 (Cox, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by MycoSolutions Inc. (SP)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Marc Core. (SP)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant William Treinen's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint Attorney Amanda J Beane added to party William Treinen(pty:dft) by William Treinen.(Beane, Amanda)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on MycoSolutions, Inc. on 5/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc. (Cox, Sarah)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on William Treinen on 5/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc. (Cox, Sarah)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Marc Core on 5/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc. (Cox, Sarah)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/21/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: Civil case number 19-cv-780 was terminated as the incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 19-cv-5454-BHS. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (ST)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Traeger Machetanz for Plaintiff The Mold Pros Franchising Inc. (Cox, Sarah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Marc Core, MycoSolutions Inc, William Treinen (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST)
May 23, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ST)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Mold Pros Franchising, Inc. (Cox, Sarah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5778390) Attorney Sarah Cox added to party The Mold Pros Franchising, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by The Mold Pros Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Cox, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mold Pros Franchising Inc v. MycoSolutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MycoSolutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Core
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Treinen
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Matthew J Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mold Pros Franchising Inc
Represented By: Traeger Machetanz
Represented By: Sarah Cox
Represented By: R Henry Pfutzenreuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?