Brown v. Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Evan Brown
Defendant: Jean M Birch, John Shafer, Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated, David Mounts, Alexander C Matina, Rob Weisberg, Yoo Jin Kim, Benjamin Hochberg, North Point Advisors LLC, Katherine L Scherping, Noah A Elbogen and Weldon Spangler
Case Number: 3:2019cv05514
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 PSLRA deadline to seek appointment as lead plaintiff re #14 Order on Stipulated Motion due 8/12/2019. (SP)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Stipulated Motion Regarding Scheduling Order; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. The Clerk of the Court is directed to strike from the record Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement (Dkt. #10 ). The Clerk is further directed to note on the motion calendar August 12, 2019 as the PSLRA deadline to seek appointment as lead plaintiff. (SP)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adrienne M Ward for North Point Advisors LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Scheduling, filed by Defendants Jean M Birch, Noah A Elbogen, Benjamin Hochberg, Yoo Jin Kim, Alexander C Matina, David Mounts, Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated, Katherine L Scherping, John Shafer, Weldon Spangler, Rob Weisberg. Noting Date 7/11/2019, (Berenstain, Ronald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adrienne M. Ward FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5837357 (Devlin, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STRICKEN PER #14 ORDER ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/23/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2019, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/17/2019) (SP).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by North Point Advisors LLC (Devlin, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John S Devlin, III on behalf of Defendant North Point Advisors LLC. (Devlin, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred to Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
July 2, 2019 JSR due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 8/13/2019. (KAM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Evan Brown by Plaintiff Evan Brown (Townsend, Roger)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/5/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
June 27, 2019 Attorneys Sean C Knowles, Joseph E. Bringman, Zachary E Davison for Jean M Birch, Noah A Elbogen, Benjamin Hochberg, Yoo Jin Kim, Alexander C Matina, David Mounts, North Point Advisors LLC, Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated, Katherine L Scherping, John Shafer, Weldon Spangler, and Rob Weisberg added per #2 Notice of Appearance. (KB) Modified on 7/1/2019 (KB).
June 27, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Add and Terminate Attorneys : Modified docket text to indicate that attorneys were NOT added as counsel for defendant North Point Advisors LLC. (KB)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MTY Franchising USA, Inc. for Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated (Berenstain, Ronald)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald L Berenstain on behalf of Defendants Jean M Birch, Noah A Elbogen, Benjamin Hochberg, Yoo Jin Kim, Alexander C Matina, David Mounts, Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated, Katherine L Scherping, John Shafer, Weldon Spangler, Rob Weisberg. (Berenstain, Ronald)
June 10, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5798198), filed by Evan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Townsend, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean M Birch
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shafer
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa Murphy's Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mounts
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander C Matina
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Weisberg
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoo Jin Kim
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Hochberg
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Point Advisors LLC
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Adrienne M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine L Scherping
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah A Elbogen
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weldon Spangler
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Brown
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?