DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Benchmark Corp et al
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Defendant: Benchmark VAR LLC, Benchmark Corp. and Benchmark Corp
Case Number: 3:2019cv05516
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BENCHMARK VAR, LLC c/o AGENTS AND CORPORATIONS, INC., REGISTERED AGENT on 6/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Durrance, Nathaniel)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/3/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Benchmark Corp and Benchmark VAR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP)
June 10, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (SP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg Data LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Durrance, Nathaniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5798352) Attorney Nathaniel Eli Durrance added to party DiscoverOrg Data LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Durrance, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Benchmark Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark VAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Eli Durrance
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?