Richardson v. Gilbert et al

Plaintiff: John A Richardson, III
Defendant: Shane Evans, Margaret Gilbert, Individual Medical Staff, Scott M Light and Theresa Hilliard
Case Number: 3:2019cv05525
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 THIRD LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please complete the enclosed Written Consent for Payment of Costs and return to the Court as soon as possible. Filer has until 8/16/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 1983 IFP Form (blank)) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Richardson, Prisoner ID: 880524)(SP)
July 14, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (consent unsigned), filed by Plaintiff John A Richardson, III. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Richardson, Prisoner ID: 880524)(SP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please complete the Written Consent for Payment of Costs and return to the Court as soon as possible. Filer has until 7/31/2019 to correct. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Richardson, Prisoner ID: 880524) (ERA)
June 30, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (consent unsigned), filed by Plaintiff John A Richardson, III. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Richardson, Prisoner ID: 880524) (ERA)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Clallam Bay Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Richardson, Prisoner ID: 880524)(GMR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Plaintiff re case number, and judge assignment and IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 7/11/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Richardson, Prisoner ID: 880524)(GMR)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff John A Richardson, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 envelope)**33 PAGE(S) RECEIVED VIA USPS, PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Richardson, Prisoner ID: 880524)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Richardson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?