Wysinger v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Perry Lee Wysinger
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv05530
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Perry Lee Wysinger. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(SP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Perry Lee Wysinger re #3 Order denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (SP)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff has 21 days from the date of this Order to pay the filing fee or file a proposed amended complaint, otherwise this case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 6/21/2019 (DN). (cc to pltf)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Perry Lee Wysinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wysinger v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Lee Wysinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?