Mangan v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Staci Mangan
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05542
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Swale, Sarah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Swale, Sarah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jesse Cowell on behalf of Plaintiff Staci Mangan. (Cowell, Jesse)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company mailed on 6/14/2019 (Roy, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah E Swale on behalf of Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Swale, Sarah)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/9/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 14, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney R Darrin Class on behalf of Plaintiff Staci Mangan. (Class, R)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Bad Faith, and Violations of the Insurance Fair Conduct Act against defendant(s) Aetna Life Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5808307), filed by Staci Mangan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mangan v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Mangan
Represented By: Christopher E Roy
Represented By: R Darrin Class
Represented By: Jesse Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?