Malone et al v. Ferguson et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Malone, Richard Jackson, George O Mitchell, Jonathan Parsons and James Turner
Defendant: Cheryl Strange, David Flynn and Robert W Ferguson
Case Number: 3:2019cv05574
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
2 Judge: Theresa L Fricke
3 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings, as related to C19-5543RJB-JRC. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (GMR- cc: pltfs)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan for all further proceedings, as related to C19-5543RJB-JRC. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by James Turner. (SP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jonathan Parsons. (SP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Richard Jackson. (SP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by George O Mitchell. (SP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Calvin Malone. (SP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #1 Letter) (SP).
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent to each Plaintiff re case number, judge assignment and IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. NOTE: an application for In Forma Pauperis status is required for each plaintiff; or a one time payment of the $400.00 filing fee is required. Plaintiffs have until 7/25/2019 to correct. (GMR- cc: plaintiffs w/forms)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Richard Jackson, Calvin Malone, George O Mitchell, Jonathan Parsons and James Turner. (No IFP/No Filing Fee) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion Requesting Class Action Status, #2 envelope)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone et al v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George O Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?