Parker v. Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc et al
Plaintiff: Linda Ann Parker and Linda A Parker
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial, LLC, Vigor Industrial LLC and Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05575
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on the #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #19 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney George D Yaron for Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc and Vigor Industrial LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (GMR)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on the #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #18 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney D. David Steele for Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc and Vigor Industrial LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (GMR)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION George D. Yaron by Defendants Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC. 0981-5867147 (Barton, Walter)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION D. David Steele by Defendants Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC. 0981-5867139 (Barton, Walter)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY George D. Yaron FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5867147 (Barton, Walter)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY D. David Steele FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5867139 (Barton, Walter)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/3/2019, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
July 29, 2019 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/9/2019.(KEB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vigor Industrial LLC for Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC (Barton, Walter)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC.(Barton, Walter)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/25/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Walter Eugene Barton on behalf of Defendants Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC. (Barton, Walter)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Randy Cohn for Linda A Parker, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher Levy for Linda A Parker, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Randy Cohn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Linda A Parker (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5822983 (Wright, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher Levy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Linda A Parker (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5822976 (Wright, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, per LCR 5.2 by Plaintiff Linda A Parker (Wright, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Vigor Industrial LLC. (GMR)
June 25, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (GMR)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. The Complaint (page 2- D.O.B.) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (GMR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT for damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5820020), filed by Linda Ann Parker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wright, Brian) Modified on 6/25/2019 - the complaint was sealed as it contains personal identifiers which are required to be redacted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 and LCR 5.2. (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Industrial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Industrial LLC
Represented By: D. David Steele
Represented By: Walter Eugene Barton
Represented By: George D Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc
Represented By: D. David Steele
Represented By: Walter Eugene Barton
Represented By: George D Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ann Parker
Represented By: Brian Michael Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A Parker
Represented By: Brian Michael Wright
Represented By: Christopher Levy
Represented By: Randy Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?