Brooks v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Robyn Brooks
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05630
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Robyn Brooks, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Batchelor, Brandon)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. Filed by Plaintiff Robyn Brooks.(Batchelor, Brandon)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Hari Kumar for Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Kastan, Joshua)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Joshua N. Kastan filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kastan, Joshua)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company, to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Kastan, Joshua)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Brandon K. Batchelor for Plaintiff Robyn Brooks from 08/22/2019 - 9/5/2019. (Batchelor, Brandon)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Joshua Nathan Kastan. Filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kastan, Joshua) Modified firm address on 8/14/2019 (DS).
August 12, 2019 REFERRING #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Brandon K. Batchelor filed by Plaintiff Robyn Brooks re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Batchelor, Brandon)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiff Robyn Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Batchelor, Brandon)
July 22, 2019 REFERRING JSR due (motion calendar tracking event only) to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 22, 2019 JSR due 9/6/2019. (JL)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 22, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AE)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/30/2019, Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2019. (AE)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AE)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AE) Modified on 7/19/2019 (AE).
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/18/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian R Davis on behalf of Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Davis, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua Nathan Kastan on behalf of Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Kastan, Joshua)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Pacific County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
July 11, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (KB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates identifying Corporate Parents/Affiliates United Services Automobile Association. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Kumar, Hari) Modified on 7/11/2019 to add corporate parent information identified in disclosure statement (KB).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kumar, Hari)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pacific County Superior Court, case number 19-2-00031-25; (Receipt # 0981-5839753), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hari Kumar in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Verification of Hari Kumar, #4 Exhibits, #5 Certificate of Service)(Kumar, Hari) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2019: #6 Complaint) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Represented By: Brian R Davis
Represented By: Hari Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Brooks
Represented By: Brandon K. Batchelor
Represented By: Matthew Tyler Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?