In re: Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
Appellee: Zurich American Insurance Company, Chicago Insurance Co, Providence Washington Insurance Company, Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies, Resource Transition Consultants LLC, DJO Services LLC, Official Unsecured Creditors Committee, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, US Trustee, Travelers Indemnity Company and Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Appeals (TAC), National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies and London Market Insurers
Appellant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Case Number: 3:2019cv05648
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal BK Internal Appeal Number 19-T005; USDC Case No 19-5648RBL; filed by Interested Party Bankruptcy Appeals. (TAC) (BAP)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 8/30/2019 (DN). (cc to DJO Svcs.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Accept Certain Sealed Bankruptcy Documents , filed by Appellant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/29/2019, (Feinberg, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Darren R. Krattli. Filed by Appellee Fraser's Boiler Service Inc. (Krattli, Darren)
August 22, 2019 The bankruptcy appeal is ripe for consideration 11/14/2019. (ERA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/1/2019; Appellee Response Brief due by 10/31/2019; Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal)(Bankruptcy Clerk S Manley(Tac)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey C Bedell on behalf of Interested Party Zurich American Insurance Company. (Bedell, Geoffrey)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Travelers Indemnity Company (Brownstein, Nancy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh (Brady, Barbara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Other Affiliate Maine Bonding for Zurich American Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Zurich American Insurance Company (Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent INA Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Brandywine Holdings Corp. for Century Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Linde, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fraser's Boiler Service Inc (Krattli, Darren)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Enstar Group Limited for Providence Washington Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Providence Washington Insurance Company (Ekberg, Charles)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies (Oliner, Aron)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, for Chicago Insurance Co. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chicago Insurance Co (Turner, Sarah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company (Turner, Sarah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Syhre, Daniel)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings as it is related to CV18-5637RBL and CV18-5638RBL. Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:18-cv-05637-RBL, 3:18-cv-05638-RBL, by Appellant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Feinberg, Michael)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, the following must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/29/2019: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA; Fraser's Boiler Service Inc; Century Indemnity Company; Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company; Chicago Insurance Co; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies; DJO Services LLC; Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh; London Market Insurers; Official Unsecured Creditors Committee; Providence Washington Insurance Company; Resource Transition Consultants LLC; Travelers Indemnity Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; if applicable. (ERA - cc: DJO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Record Status Request Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal due by 8/21/2019. (ERA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER re Filing of Bankruptcy Appeal. (ERA - cc: DJO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: PRO HAC VICE ATTORNEYS - **ACTION REQUIRED** Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice (PHV) in the Bankruptcy Court should not reapply for PHV admission with the District Court. However, all PHV attorneys appearing, participating, or wanting to continue to receive notices in bankruptcy appeals before the District Court must register with the District Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, by submitting the WAWD Attorney ECF Registration Form as instructed (attached). Failure to properly register may result in the corresponding PHV attorney's notice being terminated. (ERA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS Bankruptcy Case No 18-41245; Internal Appeal No 19-T005. Filed by Bankruptcy Appeals (Tac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Soha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chicago Insurance Co
Represented By: Jacob Cohn
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Providence Washington Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles R Ekberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacob Cohn
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas Scott Linde
Represented By: Mark D Plevin
Represented By: Michael M. Sperry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Aron M. Oliner
Represented By: Russell W. Roten
Represented By: Philip R Matthews
Represented By: Jessica Bohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Resource Transition Consultants LLC
Represented By: Kevin P Hanchett
Represented By: Craig J Litherland
Represented By: Danial D Pharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DJO Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Unsecured Creditors Committee
Represented By: Mark D Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: James P. Ruggeri
Represented By: Daniel L Syhre
Represented By: Joshua D Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Trustee
Represented By: Sarah Rose Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Frank Winston, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Taylor
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Dorsett
Represented By: Filiberto Agusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
Represented By: Katrina F Self
Represented By: Darren R. Krattli
Represented By: Danial D Pharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Appeals (TAC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh
Represented By: Michael M. Feinberg
Represented By: Diana Kay Carey
Represented By: Barbara J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Aron M. Oliner
Represented By: Russell W. Roten
Represented By: Philip R Matthews
Represented By: Jessica Bohl
Represented By: Kyle John Silk-Eglit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: London Market Insurers
Represented By: Michael M. Feinberg
Represented By: Diana Kay Carey
Represented By: Barbara J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Michael M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?