Wood v. Chung
Plaintiff: Robert Wood
Defendant: Yong Ae Chung
Case Number: 3:2019cv05652
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (GMR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Robert Wood (Terasaki, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Yong Ae Chung on 7/29/2019, filed by Plaintiff Robert Wood. (Terasaki, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Yong Ae Chung (SNP)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv-01096 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-05652-BHS. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) Yong Ae Chung (Receipt # 0981-5847029) Attorney Michael M Terasaki added to party Robert Wood(pty:pla), filed by Robert Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terasaki, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yong Ae Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wood
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Michael M Terasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?