Finch v. Whitehead et al
Plaintiff: Emanuel Finch and Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr
Defendant: K Richard Whitehead and Department of Assigned Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv05675
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr, TO RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Challenge the Sufficiency of the Pleading Under FRCP 12(b)(6) re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6). **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead, to #19 MOTION to Challenge the Sufficiency of the Pleading Under FRCP 12(b)(6) re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6). **PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(Cowger, Kristal)
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Challenge the Sufficiency of the Pleading Under FRCP 12(b)(6) re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. Noted correctly by clerk for: 9/20/2019. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead, to #13 MOTION to Remand. **PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(Cowger, Kristal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER to Attorney Kristal Cowger regarding client file request filed by Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Defendants Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6) **PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(Cowger, Kristal)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand/Remove Case back to Pierce County Superior Court, filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. Noted correctly by clerk for: 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
August 9, 2019 Noting Date Reset to 8/5/2019 re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Response to correct noting date per LCR 7(d)(1). **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900) (ERA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr to Atty Kristal M Cowger re Defendants' and Plaintiff's file, filed by Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(SP)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr, to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6). **52 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION OF MAILING, filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900) (ERA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Response, filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Objection) Noted by clerk for 8/5/2019 8/23/2019. **54 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900) (ERA) Modified on 8/9/2019 (ERA).
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Denying Defendant's #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6), filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900) (ERA)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Scheduling Order, filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr. Noted by clerk for 8/23/2019. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900) (ERA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PRO SE INMATE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6) ; filed by Defendants Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead. **PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(Cowger, Kristal)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6), filed by Defendants Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/23/2019, **PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(Cowger, Kristal)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead **PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(Cowger, Kristal)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to Parties re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
July 26, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton and Judge J Richard Creatura added. **DO NOT PRINT**(Emanuel Finch, Prisoner ID: 348900)(GMR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead (Cowger, Kristal)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-08606-3; (Receipt # 0981-5858921), filed by Department of Assigned Counsel, K Richard Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons (Cowger, Kristal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finch v. Whitehead et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Richard Whitehead
Represented By: Kristal M Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Assigned Counsel
Represented By: Kristal M Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Leonard Finch, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?