Clanton v. Wyndham Destinations Inc et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Clanton
Defendant: Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc, John Doe and Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv05685
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND Attorney Zachariah R Tomlin added to party Wyndham Destinations Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Zachariah R Tomlin added to party Wyndham Resort Development Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Zachariah R Tomlin added to party Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc(pty:dft) by Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.(Tomlin, Zachariah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Corporate Creations Network, Inc., Registered Agent for Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. on 8/13/2019, filed by Plaintiff Catherine Clanton. (Gooding, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Corporate Creations Network, Inc., Registered Agent for Wyndham Destinations, Inc. on 8/13/2019, filed by Plaintiff Catherine Clanton. (Gooding, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Corporate Creations Network, Inc., Registered Agent for Wyndham Resort Development Corporation on 8/13/2019, filed by Plaintiff Catherine Clanton. (Gooding, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, and Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SP)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Catherine Clanton (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Gooding, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Catherine Clanton. (Gooding, James)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/21/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv-01163 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-05685-RBL. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SNP)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for damages against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5860515) Attorney James F Gooding added to party Catherine Clanton(pty:pla), filed by Catherine Clanton.(Gooding, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clanton v. Wyndham Destinations Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Clanton
Represented By: James F Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Destinations Inc
Represented By: Zachariah R Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc
Represented By: Zachariah R Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Zachariah R Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?