Covington v. Safeway Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Covington
Defendant: Safeway, John and Jane Does 1-10 and Safeway Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05750
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by Safeway Inc.(Reppart, Kimberly)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Kitsap County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
August 13, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Safeway (Reppart, Kimberly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates identifying Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates Albertson's Holdings LLC and AB Acquisition LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeway (Reppart, Kimberly) Modified on 8/13/2019 to add corporate parent information provided in disclosure statement (KB).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Safeway (Reppart, Kimberly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL ; filed by Defendant Safeway. (Reppart, Kimberly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY REPPART IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Safeway (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Reppart, Kimberly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kitsap County Superior Court, case number 19-2-01948-18; (Receipt # 0981-5882259), filed by Safeway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Reppart, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covington v. Safeway Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Covington
Represented By: Crystal J McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Represented By: Alexandra E Ormsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?