Gillhoover v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hannah Gillhoover
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05751
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/6/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
August 14, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (SP)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Foley, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 19-2-02379-06; (Receipt # 0981-5882796), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foley, Douglas) Modified on 8/14/2019 to add State Court Complaint language (SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillhoover v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas F Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Gillhoover
Represented By: Beau D Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?