Hartford v. Davis
Petitioner: Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV
Respondent: Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv05771
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Mail addressed to Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV returned as "Inmate No Longer Here" re #8 Order to Show Cause. (SP)
October 2, 2019 Response to #8 Order due by 11/19/2019. (SP)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO UPDATE ADDRESS; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. If petitioner fails to notify the Court of his current mailing address by November 19, 2019, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to mail petitioner a copy of this Order to his last known address. (SP- cc: plaintiff)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Mail addressed to Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV returned as "Inmate No Longer Here" re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Order to Show Cause. (SP)
August 29, 2019 Response to Show Cause #6 Order due by 9/30/2019. (SP)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Or Amend #5 Petition; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. If plaintiff fails to adequately address the issues raised herein or does not file an amended pleading on or before 9/30/2019, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to provide petitioner with the forms for filing a petition for habeas corpus relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and forms for filing a 42 U.S.C. 1983 civil rights complaint. (SP- cc: petitioner w/Order and forms)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV. (IFP Granted) (SP)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. The Clerk is directed to file petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus without the prepayment of fees.(SP- cc: petitioner)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Letter)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?