Shook v. City of Tacoma
Plaintiff: Mitchell Shook
Defendant: City of Tacoma's Public Works Department and City of Tacoma
Case Number: 3:2019cv05794
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 26 Fourth DECLARATION of MITCHELL SHOOK filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook re #6 MOTION to Remand; or Alternative Demand for Jury Trial (Shook, Mitchell)
October 14, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Remand; or Alternative Demand for Jury Trial (Shook, Mitchell)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Tacoma, to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Sloan, Millard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Tacoma, to #6 MOTION to Remand; or Alternative Demand for Jury Trial. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Declaration of Alan Matheson)(Sloan, Millard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for TRO Hearing held on 10/1/2019 before Judge Benjamin H. Settle - Dep Clerk: Gretchen Craft; Pla Counsel: Pro Se; Def Counsel: Millard Joseph Sloan, Jr., David Rifkind (via telephone); CR: Angela Nicolavo; Time of Hearing: 2:00; Courtroom: E; Court hears arguments and DENIES #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for the reasons stated on the record. Court sets a briefing schedule, as stated on the record: Defendant's brief due 10/11/2019, response due 10/18/2019, reply due 10/23/2019. (MGC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 Second DECLARATION of MITCHELL SHOOK filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Shook, Mitchell)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Shook, Mitchell)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Tacoma, to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Exhibit B)(Sloan, Millard)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David F Rifkind for City of Tacoma, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #16 Application: Strike entry/ filer will re-file using correct event (CDA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Rifkind FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant City of Tacoma (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5944522 (Sloan, Millard)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 DISREGARD/ INCORRECT EVENT APPLICATION David F. Rifkind by Defendant City of Tacoma. (Sloan, Millard) Modified on 9/27/2019 strike entry/ filer will re-file with correct event (CDA).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE AND SETTING HEARING signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The Court requests a full response from the City re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order no later than Monday, September 30, 2019, and sets a hearing for Tuesday, October 1, 2019, at 2:00PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Remand; or Alternative Demand for Jury Trial, #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #11 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Response to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO (Shook, Mitchell)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Tacoma, to #11 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Response to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Alan Matheson, #2 Supplement Declaration of M. Joseph Sloan, #3 Supplement Declaration of Greg Muller)(Sloan, Millard)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The City has until 12:00PM tomorrow, September 25, 2019, to inform the Court as to the status of the pending sale and respond to at least the irreparable harm element of Shook's #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (GMR)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Response to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO, filed by Defendant City of Tacoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Def Motion to Extend Time for Filing Response to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO) Noting Date 9/24/2019, (Sloan, Millard)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY, filed by Defendant City of Tacoma, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Sloan, Millard)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of PLAINTIFF MITCHELL SHOOK filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Shook, Mitchell)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/23/2019, (Shook, Mitchell) Modified on 9/23/2019 to remove duplicate text only (GMR).
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of PLAINTIFF MITCHELL SHOOK filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook re #6 MOTION to Remand , Proposed Order, Affidavit of Service (Shook, Mitchell)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand; or Alternative Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Shook. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/11/2019, (Shook, Mitchell) Modified on 9/23/2019 (GMR).
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: Plaintiff Mitchell Shook has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/18/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. cc: Pltf (MGC)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant City of Tacoma (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Sloan, Millard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP- cc: plaintiff)
August 29, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 19-2-03950-34; (Receipt # TAC0158850), filed by City of Tacoma's Public Works Department. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sloan, Millard) Modified on 8/29/2019 to add payment info (SP). Modified on 8/29/2019 to add court information (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shook v. City of Tacoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Shook
Represented By: Mitchell Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tacoma's Public Works Department
Represented By: Millard Joseph Sloan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tacoma
Represented By: Millard Joseph Sloan, Jr.
Represented By: David F Rifkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?